Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph-Emmanuel de Crussol d’Uzès d’Amboise

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1735BornParis
176731.6SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
20 Jun 176833.0ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
17 Jul 176833.1Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
7 Jun 178954.0DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph-Emmanuel de Crussol d’Uzès d’Amboise:
Bishop François-Joseph-Emmanuel de Crussol d’Uzès d’Amboise (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013