Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Celse-Roger de Rabutin de Bussy

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹BornParis
1696¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 172354.8SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
12 Jan 172455.0ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
20 Feb 172455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
3 Nov 173667.8DiedBishop of Luçon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel-Celse-Roger de Rabutin de Bussy:
Bishop Michel-Celse-Roger de Rabutin de Bussy (born 1669, died ) Bishop of Luçon

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015