Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Eugène-Emile Choquet

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1878Born
4 Jul 190324.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 193556.5AppointedBishop of Langres, France
25 Jul 193556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
11 Feb 193859.2AppointedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
20 Apr 194667.4DiedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Eugène-Emile Choquet
Bishop Georges-Eugène-Emile Choquet (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,935, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast