Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Louis de Clermont-Tonnerre

Deceased

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660Born
25 Dec 169535.9AppointedBishop of Langres, France
14 Oct 169636.7Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
12 Mar 172464.1DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for François-Louis de Clermont-Tonnerre:
Bishop François-Louis de Clermont-Tonnerre (died ) Bishop of Langres

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015