Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Antoine de Salinis

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1798BornMorlaas
1 Jun 182223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
23 Feb 184950.5SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
2 Apr 184950.6ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
29 Jul 184951.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
27 Feb 185657.5SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
16 Jun 185657.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
10 Aug 185658.0InstalledArchbishop of Auch, France
30 Jan 186162.5DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Antoine de Salinis:
Archbishop Louis-Antoine de Salinis (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 94, and Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013