Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Bouthillier de Chavigny

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1642BornParis
28 Mar 166623.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 167633.4SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
22 Jun 167633.8ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
17 Oct 167836.1SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
6 Feb 167936.4ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
9 Apr 167936.6Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
169754.3ResignedBishop of Troyes, France
15 Nov 173189.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for François Bouthillier de Chavigny:
Bishop François Bouthillier de Chavigny (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 330, and Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014