Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard-Adolphe Cantel

Deceased

Bishop of Oran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1836BornMarseille
24 Jun 186024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
8 Jul 189862.0SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
28 Nov 189862.4ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
24 Feb 189962.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
19 Mar 189962.7InstalledBishop of Oran, Algeria
10 Dec 191074.5DiedBishop of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Edouard-Adolphe Cantel:
Bishop Edouard-Adolphe Cantel (born , died ) Bishop of Oran

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013