Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Hippolyte Cardinal Guibert, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1802Born
14 Aug 182522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
7 Aug 184138.6SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
24 Jan 184239.1ConfirmedBishop of Viviers, France
11 Mar 184239.2Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
14 Feb 185754.1SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
19 Mar 185754.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
8 Aug 187168.6SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
27 Oct 187168.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
22 Dec 187371.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 187471.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
8 Jul 188683.5DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hippolyte Guibert (VIAF: 56600933)
Joseph Hippolyte Cardinal Guibert O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-en-Provence
Ordained BishopSaint-Cannat, Marseille, Diocese of Marseille
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Current)Sacred Heart in Montmartre, Basilica, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441, and Page 572
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,842, Number 12
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 217, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 263, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 345, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 364, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 418, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 491, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 541, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 624, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 671, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 725, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 852, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast