Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Foucquet

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1611BornParis
28 Feb 163927.5AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
15 May 163927.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
1643¹31.4ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
16 Nov 164332.3AppointedBishop of Agde, France
16 Oct 165645.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Narbonne, France
17 Mar 165947.6SucceededArchbishop of Narbonne, France
19 Oct 167362.2DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Foucquet:
Archbishop François Foucquet (born , died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 72, and Page 108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015