Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprien-Gabriel Bénard de Résay

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornParis
1 Nov 168939.8SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
10 Mar 169242.1ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
24 Aug 169242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
5 Jan 173787.0DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyprien-Gabriel Bénard de Résay:
Bishop Cyprien-Gabriel Bénard de Résay (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015