Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin de Brichanteau, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Laon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1585BornParis
23 Jun 160822.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Laon, France
23 Jun 160822.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
28 Mar 161226.5SucceededBishop of Laon, France
13 Jul 161933.8DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Benjamin de Brichanteau:
Bishop Benjamin de Brichanteau C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Laon

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015