Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Bourgoing

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568¹BornParis
10 May 162355.3AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
9 Jul 162355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
19 Apr 162557.2DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Bourgoing:
Bishop Nicolas Bourgoing (died ) Bishop of Coutances

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015