Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Duval

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
8 Jun 154545.4AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
9 Aug 154545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
1564¹64.0ResignedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
13 Oct 156464.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Duval
Bishop Pierre Duval (born 1500, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Church, Caudebec en Caux

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Sep 2017