Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Bochart de Champigny

Deceased

Bishop of Valence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹Born
4 Apr 167626.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 169141.7SelectedBishop of Valence, France
12 Oct 169343.7ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
30 Nov 169343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
4 Jul 170555.5DiedBishop of Valence, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Bochart de Champigny
Bishop Guillaume Bochart de Champigny (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Valence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast