Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Honoré de Beauvillier de Saint-Aignan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1682BornParis
1 Apr 171330.5AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
1 Oct 171331.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
10 Apr 172845.5ResignedBishop of Beauvais, France
19 Aug 175168.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for François-Honoré de Beauvillier de Saint-Aignan:
Bishop François-Honoré de Beauvillier de Saint-Aignan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013