Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Hector Cardinal Coullié (Couillié)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1829BornParis
23 Dec 185425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
23 Aug 187647.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
29 Sep 187647.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Orléans, France
29 Sep 187647.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
19 Nov 187647.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
11 Oct 187849.6SucceededBishop of Orléans, France
14 Jun 189364.3SelectedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
15 Jun 189364.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
19 Apr 189768.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 189869.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
12 Sep 191283.5DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Hector Coullié (Couillié):
Cardinal Pierre-Hector Coullié (Couillié) (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 518, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013