Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Armand-Gaston-Maximilien Cardinal de Rohan de Soubise

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1674BornParis
28 Feb 170126.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Apr 170126.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Apr 170126.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
26 Jun 170127.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
10 Apr 170429.8SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
18 May 171237.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172147.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
19 Jul 174975.1DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Armand-Gaston-Maximilien de Rohan de Soubise:
Cardinal Armand-Gaston-Maximilien de Rohan de Soubise (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 48.1 years
  • a cardinal for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 98, and Page 379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013