Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Raymond Germain Benoit-Gonnin, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1952 Born
30 Sep 198432.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 198533.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
18 Mar 201057.7AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
2 May 201057.8Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Raymond Germain Benoit-Gonnin
Bishop Jacques Raymond Germain Benoit-Gonnin Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThoiry
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Beauvais, Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,640
  • od/c01: AJ, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast