Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger-Henri-Marie Beaussart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1879Born
19 Dec 190324.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 193555.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
19 Jun 193555.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elatea
9 Oct 193556.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elatea
10 Dec 194364.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
29 Feb 195272.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Roger-Henri-Marie Beaussart
Archbishop Roger-Henri-Marie Beaussart (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpinal

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast