Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Bannes d’Avéjan

Deceased

Bishop of Alès (Alais)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688¹BornParis
16 Jun 172133.4AppointedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
27 Jul 172133.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
23 May 174456.3DiedBishop of Alès (Alais), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bannes d’Avéjan:
Bishop Charles de Bannes d’Avéjan (born 1688, died ) Bishop of Alès (Alais)

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015