Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Etienne-Charles Cardinal de Loménie de Brienne

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1727BornParis
8 Mar 175224.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 176032.9SelectedBishop of Condom, France
15 Dec 176033.1ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
11 Jan 176133.2Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
30 Jan 176335.3SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
21 Mar 176335.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
23 Jan 178860.2SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
10 Mar 178860.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
15 Dec 178861.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 178861.1AppointedCardinal-Priest
26 Sep 179163.9ResignedCardinal-Priest
19 Feb 179466.3DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Charles de Loménie de Brienne:
Etienne-Charles Cardinal de Loménie de Brienne (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1788
  • c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015