Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Poncher

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹Born
14 Mar 151939.2AppointedBishop of Paris, France
8 May 151939.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
1 Sep 153252.6DiedBishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Poncher
Bishop François Poncher (born 1480, died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast