Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Anne Aubert de Villeserin

Deceased

Bishop of Senez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹Born
3 Jan 166228.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 167137.2SelectedBishop of Senez, France
1 Jul 167137.5ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
9 Aug 167137.6Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
7 Feb 169561.0DiedBishop of Senez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Anne Aubert de Villeserin
Bishop Louis-Anne Aubert de Villeserin (born 1634, died ) Bishop of Senez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast