Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Marca

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1594BornGan
28 Dec 164248.9SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
13 Jan 164853.9ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
25 Oct 164854.7Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
27 May 165258.3SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
23 Mar 165460.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
26 Feb 166268.0SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
5 Jun 166268.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
29 Jun 166268.4DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Marca:
Archbishop Pierre de Marca (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160, and Page 274
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015