Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Sylvestre de La Châtre

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hemeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1754BornParis, France
21 Dec 178228.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181763.3SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
1 Oct 181763.4ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
8 Jan 182368.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Beauvais, France
17 Nov 182369.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
25 Jan 182469.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
5 Feb 182974.7DiedTitular Bishop of Hemeria

MicroData Summary for Louis-Sylvestre de La Châtre:
Bishop Louis-Sylvestre de La Châtre (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hemeria

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 108, and Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013