Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Denis-Simon Cardinal de Marquemont

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima TrinitÓ al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1572BornParis
Dec 1603³31.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
5 Nov 161240.0AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
11 Nov 161240.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
19 Jan 162653.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162653.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima TrinitÓ al Monte Pincio
16 Sep 162653.9DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis-Simon de Marquemont:
Denis-Simon Cardinal de Marquemont (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1612, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015