Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Mallier du Houssay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornParis
1 Feb 164949.0AppointedBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Apr 164949.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
1668²68.0ResignedBishop of Tarbes, France
21 Sep 168181.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude Mallier du Houssay:
Bishop Claude Mallier du Houssay (born 1600, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015