Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Augustin Méliand (Melrand)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1626BornParis
21 Jul 167953.0SelectedBishop of Gap, France
27 May 168053.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
28 Jul 168054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
31 May 168457.8SelectedBishop of Alet, France
7 Jul 169265.9ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
24 Oct 169872.2ResignedBishop of Alet, France
23 Sep 171387.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alet, France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Augustin Méliand (Melrand):
Bishop Victor-Augustin Méliand (Melrand) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alet

  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193, and Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015