Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-René-Edouard Cardinal de Rohan-Guéménée

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1734Born
1756²21.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 175925.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
24 Mar 176025.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
24 Mar 176025.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
18 May 176025.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
1 Jun 177843.6Elevated to Cardinal
11 Mar 177944.4SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
29 Nov 180167.1ResignedBishop of Strasbourg, France
16 Feb 180368.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-René-Edouard de Rohan-Guéménée
Louis-René-Edouard Cardinal de Rohan-Guéménée (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
  • a cardinal for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99, and Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast