Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Hurault de Cheverny

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1579Born
7 Jan 160828.3AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
27 May 162040.6DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Hurault de Cheverny (VIAF: 51843105)
Bishop Philippe Hurault de Cheverny (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast