Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Picard de la Vacquerie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1893Born
29 Jun 192127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
16 Jul 194652.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Doara
9 Oct 194653.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doara
27 Aug 195158.0AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
23 May 196369.8ResignedBishop of Orléans, France
23 May 196369.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
17 Mar 196975.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Picard de la Vacquerie (VIAF: 90714841)
Archbishop Robert Picard de la Vacquerie (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharenton, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceOrléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 80
  • op/c1/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast