Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Boyer, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1675BornParis
8 Apr 169217.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
4 Apr 169924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Jan 173054.8SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
11 Dec 173055.7ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
6 Jan 173155.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
4 May 173762.1ResignedBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Aug 175580.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mirepoix, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Boyer:
Bishop Jean-François Boyer C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015