Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Louis Roger Sylvain Batut

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1954 BornParigi
23 Jun 198430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
28 Nov 200854.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
28 Nov 200854.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ressiana
10 Jan 200954.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ressiana
22 Nov 201460.4AppointedBishop of Blois, France
11 Jan 201560.5InstalledBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Louis Roger Sylvain Batut:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Louis Roger Sylvain Batut (born ) Bishop of Blois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Blois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,043
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 23 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014