Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Mallier du Houssay

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornParis
7 Apr 163633.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Troyes, France
7 Apr 163633.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
6 Jul 163633.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
2 Nov 164138.8SucceededBishop of Troyes, France
11 Oct 167875.7DiedBishop of Troyes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Mallier du Houssay: VIAF:89701924
Bishop François Mallier du Houssay (died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342, and Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015