Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Philippe d’Auneau de Visé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹Born
171145.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
14 Mar 171852.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Mar 171852.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
8 Oct 171953.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
21 Jun 172963.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Philippe d’Auneau de Visé
Bishop Louis Philippe d’Auneau de Visé (born 1666, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast