Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Hautin

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1831Born
23 Dec 185423.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 189059.0SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
26 Jun 189059.1ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
8 Sep 189059.3Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
14 Jun 189362.1SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
15 Jun 189362.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
6 Feb 190775.7DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for François Hautin (VIAF: 89576450)
Archbishop François Hautin (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopOrléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198, and Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017