Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Gustave-Émile Leclerc

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Hephaestus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1891BornLuzarches
30 Jun 192230.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 194756.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
8 Nov 194756.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
22 Dec 194756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
Dec 1966³75.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
25 Nov 197786.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André-Gustave-Émile Leclerc:
Bishop André-Gustave-Émile Leclerc (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013