Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Marie-Joseph Lecourtier

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Montpellier

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1799BornParis
5 Jan 182323.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 186161.5SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
22 Jul 186161.6ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
24 Aug 186161.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
12 Jan 187474.1RetiredBishop of Montpellier, France
16 Jan 187474.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
20 Aug 188585.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Joseph Lecourtier:
Archbishop François-Marie-Joseph Lecourtier (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montpellier

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 394, and Page 506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013