Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Maigrot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Conana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹Born
1676¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
1680²28.0ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
5 Feb 168735.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
5 Feb 168735.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
22 Oct 169644.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Conana
14 Mar 170048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Conana
4 May 170856.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
28 Feb 173078.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Maigrot
Bishop Charles Maigrot M.E.P. (born 1652, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopKiashin
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jun 2020

Quantcast