Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Marie Cardinal Villot

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1905Born
29 Jun 192923.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
19 Apr 193024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
2 Sep 195448.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
2 Sep 195448.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vinda
12 Oct 195449.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vinda
17 Dec 195954.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
17 Dec 195954.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bosporus
17 Jan 196559.2SucceededArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
22 Feb 196559.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196559.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
7 Apr 196761.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
2 May 196963.5AppointedSecretary of State
16 Oct 197065.0AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
15 Jul 197165.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
12 Dec 197469.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
4 Sep 197872.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
9 Mar 197973.4DiedSecretary of State

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Villot (VIAF: 30336122)
Jean-Marie Cardinal Villot (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Amant-Tallende, Diocese of Clermont, France
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)SS. Trinità al Monte Pincio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast