Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François d’Argouges

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹Born
24 Dec 168733.9SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
4 Feb 169238.0ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
30 Mar 169238.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
15 Mar 171662.2DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François d’Argouges
Bishop François d’Argouges (born 1654, died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 408
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast