Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Gaspard-Guillaume de Vintimille du Luc

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1655BornLuc-en-Provence
31 May 168428.5SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
21 Jan 169236.1ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
25 Mar 169236.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
10 Feb 170852.2SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
14 May 170852.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
3 Nov 170852.9InstalledArchbishop of Aix, France
10 May 172973.4SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
17 Aug 172973.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
13 Mar 174690.3DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Gaspard-Guillaume de Vintimille du Luc:
Archbishop Charles-Gaspard-Guillaume de Vintimille du Luc (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a bishop for 53.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015