Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Bénigne Hervé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650BornParis
13 Apr 167525.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168434.4SelectedBishop of Gap, France
15 Oct 169242.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
7 Dec 169242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
170656.0ResignedBishop of Gap, France
27 Jun 172272.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Bénigne Hervé:
Bishop Charles-Bénigne Hervé (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gap

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013