Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Schoepfer

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1843BornWettolsheim
22 Dec 186623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
7 Dec 189956.6SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
14 Dec 189956.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
22 Feb 190056.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Aug 192784.3DiedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Schoepfer:
Bishop François-Xavier Schoepfer (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013