Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Pavillon

Deceased

Bishop of Alet, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1597Born
2 Jun 163739.5SelectedBishop of Alet, France
16 May 163941.4ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
21 Aug 163941.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
8 Dec 167780.0DiedBishop of Alet, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Pavillon (VIAF: 2510442)
Bishop Nicolas Pavillon (born , died ) Bishop of Alet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast