Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Potier

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹Born
23 Sep 159622.7AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Feb 159723.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
4 Oct 161642.7DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René Potier (VIAF: 220270299)
Bishop René Potier (born 1574, died ) Bishop of Beauvais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSte Genevieve, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceBeauvais, Diocese of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast