Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Ernest Cardinal Dubois

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1856Born
20 Sep 187923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Le Mans, France
5 Apr 190144.5SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
18 Apr 190144.6ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
2 Jul 190144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
30 Nov 190953.2AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
3 Feb 191053.4InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
13 Mar 191659.5AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
4 Dec 191660.2Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191660.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
13 Sep 192064.0AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
23 Sep 192973.0DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Ernest Dubois (VIAF: 100900910)
Louis-Ernest Cardinal Dubois (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Calais

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 592
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 31
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 87
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 244, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 268, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 401, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 418, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 550, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 674, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,038, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast