Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles-Philippe Cardinal Place

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1814Born
30 Mar 185036.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 186651.9SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
22 Jun 186652.3ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
26 Aug 186652.5Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
8 Jul 187864.4SelectedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
15 Jul 187864.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
10 Oct 187864.6InstalledArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
7 Jun 188672.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188773.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
5 Mar 189379.0DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Philippe Place (VIAF: 49216233)
Charles-Philippe Cardinal Place (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopConsistory Hall, Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 372, and Page 478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017