Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Christian Alain Aupetit

Archbishop of Paris, France

Ordinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1951 Born
2 Oct 199443.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
24 Jun 199544.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
2 Feb 201361.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
2 Feb 201361.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
19 Apr 201362.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
4 Apr 201463.0AppointedBishop of Nanterre, France
4 May 201463.1InstalledBishop of Nanterre, France
7 Dec 201766.7AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
6 Jan 201866.7InstalledArchbishop of Paris, France
8 Jan 201866.7AppointedOrdinary of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites

MicroData Summary for Michel Christian Alain Aupetit (VIAF: 173751704)
Archbishop Michel Christian Alain Aupetit (born ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained DeaconSaint-Philippe du Roule, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Paris.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Feb 2013
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,765
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2014
  • i: CB, 2 May 2014
  • c1: AJ, 8 Mar 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 7 Dec 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2018
  • od/c0: AJ, 23 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 May 2018

Quantcast