Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isaac Habert

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornParis
30 Apr 164545.3SelectedBishop of Vabres, France
18 Sep 164545.7ConfirmedBishop of Vabres, France
17 Dec 164545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vabres, France
15 Sep 166868.7DiedBishop of Vabres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isaac Habert:
Bishop Isaac Habert (died ) Bishop of Vabres

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015